Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rory W Clark, against Does 1-10, Stein, Tim D., represented by Barry H Spitzer, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions475 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time504 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-07-31T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-10-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-07-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-07-31T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-09-07T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Motion) filed.
Date: September 21, 2010Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2009-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-10-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (non appearance pursuant to CRC 3.1304(c)) filed.
Date: 2010-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: December 13, 2010Order - Other (Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment) filed.
Date: December 17, 2010Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 18, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.