Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Daniel T Schmaeling, against Sears, Roebuck And Co, Does 1-30, Diakon Logistics Delaware Inc, Diakon Logistics, Roes 1 - 50, (total of 6) See All represented by Douglas M Kilduff, Daniel Mccrary, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions502 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1307 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-08-13T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-07-31T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-09-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Responses and Discovery) filed.
Date: 2010-05-21T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2010-06-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Extend Arbitration Date filed.
Date: 2010-09-17T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2010-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Agreement to Serve as Arbitrator filed.
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Extend Arbitration Date
Date: 2010-09-22T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.
Date: 2010-11-02T00:00:00Answer submitted by Sears, Roebuck and Co rejected on 10/21/2010 .
Date: 2010-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2010-11-02T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Setting Aside Default of Diakon Logistics (Deleware) Inc.) filed.
Date: 2011-02-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2010-12-15T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: October 30, 2012Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-08-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for TSP Referral - Clock Start Calendar heard on 08/15/2012 03:06:00 PM .
Date: 2012-08-15T00:00:00Rejection of Arbitration Award and Request for Trial De Novo filed.
Date: 2012-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: February 27, 2013Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: December 13, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.