Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael S Hunt, against Freeman, Albert T., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Matthew J. Gary presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1458 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3603 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Counsel Requesting Trial) filed.
Date: 2013-01-25T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed.
Date: April 26, 2013Fee Waiver - Order re Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed.
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-08-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of plf in Lieu of Personal Testimony at Trial CCP98) filed.
Date: 2013-01-18T00:00:00Certification for Short Cause Matters filed.
Date: 2013-01-25T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 17, 2013Minutes finalized for Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/26/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: March 11, 2019Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: August 21, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.