Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stelios A Harris, against Does 1-100, Keech, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions426 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1660 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: March 01, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Erica L Brachfeld Pursuant to CCP 1033b 1 and 2) filed.
Date: 2010-03-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-04-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: August 11, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: October 18, 2012Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: July 17, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 15, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 11, 2010Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-03-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.