State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Fuqua, Cedric L.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Fuqua, Cedric L.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Fuqua, Cedric L.
Date
Type
Description
August 22, 2016
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
August 08, 2016
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
August 02, 2010
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
November 19, 2009
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
May 13, 2009
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
May 13, 2009
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Issued
November 25, 2008
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
November 25, 2008
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
November 25, 2008
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
November 25, 2008
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .