Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Dekoven, Carolyn Y., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time1805 days |
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: May 26, 2010Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: July 02, 2012Writ of Execution Issued
Date: April 29, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: January 19, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: March 21, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: November 04, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.