Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Meyers, Ronald W., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Eugene L. Balonon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEugene L. Balonon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time1473 days |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: January 20, 2012Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2009-07-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2011-11-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: 2010-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: December 16, 2011Proposed Order filed.
Date: 2011-12-16T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2010-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: 2011-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: January 11, 2012Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 09, 2012Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2011-08-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.