Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Marquez Iii, Rudolph, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time3241 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: October 10, 2017Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: July 15, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: December 14, 2012Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: October 22, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.