Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Toscano, Rodolfo, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time1392 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: September 17, 2012Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: November 30, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: May 20, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: July 06, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
Date: August 06, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.