Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Stewart, Robert S., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time2928 days |
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: November 29, 2010Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: December 03, 2009Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: October 06, 2016Writ of Execution Issued
Date: April 08, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 04, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: July 07, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: September 10, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.