Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Mena, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time1777 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: August 12, 2013Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: October 12, 2009Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: November 29, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: March 05, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 28, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: January 15, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.