Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Kigano, Tony, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time2912 days |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: July 20, 2016Order on Claim of Exemption
Date: May 22, 2009Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: April 21, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: October 01, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.