Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Wiltz, Karrie L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time1743 days |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: October 06, 2010Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2009-03-05T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: June 29, 2012Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: June 08, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2009-03-05T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: September 07, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 08, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: October 04, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.