Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Diaz, Toby K., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time1185 days |
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: February 01, 2011Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: March 20, 2010Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: September 29, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: June 20, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: December 17, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: October 28, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: June 15, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.