We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department ,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department ,
against
Gutierrez, Pedro R. ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
July 30, 2008
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Matter Type
General Employment
Case Cycle Time
3334 days
Plaintiffs
State Of California, Employment Development Department
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
State Of California, Employment Development Department
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Gutierrez, Pedro R.
Date
Type
Description
September 15, 2017
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Get Document
June 12, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
September 19, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Get Document
May 27, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
May 05, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
June 07, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Get Document
April 19, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Get Document
July 30, 2008
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
Get Document
July 30, 2008
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
July 30, 2008
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.