Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Erica L Brachfeld, against Does 1-100, Nguyen, Thuy T., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions85 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time847 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: March 25, 2009Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: March 25, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-03-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: April 26, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: April 26, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.