Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stelios A Harris, against Does 1-100, Dzurinko, Holly, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions379 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1667 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: January 13, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-10-14T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-03-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Erica L Brachfeld Pursuant To CCP 1033 b 1 and 2) filed.
Date: January 13, 2010Default denied as to Dzurinko, Holly on Complaint .
Date: 2009-10-14T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-01-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-01-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: July 24, 2013Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: June 24, 2010Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: May 17, 2010Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: June 24, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.