Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stelios A Harris, against Berry, Seantia N., Does 1-100, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions288 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1903 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-10-14T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-05-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-10-14T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-10-14T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 20, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: December 20, 2010Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: April 26, 2010Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: April 26, 2010Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2010-04-19T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: October 18, 2012Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: July 24, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 17, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.