Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stelios A Harris, against Does 1-100, Henderson, Madeline, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1837 days |
Request for Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-07-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: December 09, 2009Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2009-05-14T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-03-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-05-14T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default submitted by The Superior Court of Sacramento rejected on 04/29/2009 .
Date: 2009-04-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does - Default Judgment Pending filed.
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00Returned Document Form - Re: Declarations - various
Date: 2009-04-30T00:00:00Returned Document Form - Re: Judgment by Default by Clerk
Date: 2009-04-30T00:00:00Returned Document Form - Re: Request for Dismissal (of Does)
Date: 2009-09-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Re: Calculation of Interest & Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2009-07-28T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: December 09, 2009Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 20, 2010Declaration - Other (Pursuant to CCP 1033 b) filed.
Date: 2009-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: April 19, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: January 10, 2014Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: July 17, 2013Writ of Execution Issued
Date: January 02, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.