Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Federated Financial Corporation Of America, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Halie L Leonard, against The Wine Broker Inc, Mcguigan Iii, Owen, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4019 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2010-04-05T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: December 16, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Assignment of Claim and the Entry of Judgment) filed.
Date: 2009-07-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: December 16, 2019Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: December 16, 2019Request for Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-07-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-29T00:00:00Returned Document Form-Summons back to the court
Date: 2009-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-01-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2009-04-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: 2010-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2010-05-10T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution (SAN DIEGO) Issued
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Writ of Execution (San Diego) Issued
Date: August 24, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 15, 2018Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: January 11, 2018Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: December 31, 2019Declaration - Other (of Angela Davtyan RE Accrued Interest) filed.
Date: December 16, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.