National Credit Adjusters Llc,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Andrew Ford,
against
Weaver, Annette L.,
Does 1-20,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Details for
National Credit Adjusters Llc v. Weaver, Annette L.
, et al.
Case Events for
National Credit Adjusters Llc v. Weaver, Annette L.
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
August 05, 2011
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/18/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins
August 05, 2011
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
August 05, 2011
Docket Event
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
August 05, 2011
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
July 29, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
April 04, 2011
Docket Event
Declaration - Other (Andrew Ford in support of entry of judgment pursuant to stipulation) submitted by National Credit Adjusters LLC rejected on 04/04/2011 .
March 10, 2011
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 03/10/2011 08:30:00 AM .
March 10, 2011
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/18/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice to File Dismissal and/or Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal has been generated .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins
March 10, 2011
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program rescheduled to 08/18/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins
March 10, 2011
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program continued to 08/18/2011 at 08:30 in this department.