Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brian N Winn, against Does 1-10, Leishman, Robert E., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time146 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: April 22, 2009Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: March 13, 2009Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: March 13, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE: UNDERLYING ACTION OF ACCOUNT STATED) filed.
Date: March 13, 2009Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-12-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES) filed.
Date: March 13, 2009Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE: EXCESS OF INTEREST) filed.
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE: INTEREST) filed.
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 19, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.