Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wawanesa General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mark R Nivinskus, against Does 1-20, Fossum, Cynthia, Negash, Robel, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions171 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time594 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: January 08, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-05-15T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: June 12, 2009Declaration - Other (Declaration Pursuant To Code of Civil Procedure Section 585) filed.
Date: 2009-06-12T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: April 02, 2010Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: January 08, 2010Certificate of Facts Re: Unsatisfied Judgment
Date: August 09, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.