Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Weyhe, John, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Mark P Velez, against Does 1 To 50, Lastname Unknown, Sam, True, Mark, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, represented by Gregory L. Spallas, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial523 days |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions547 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time547 days |
Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 8 to Preclude Evidence by Expert Witness Dorajane Apuna) filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Evidence of Settlement Discussions) filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motions In Limine Number 1 - 13) filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 9 to Preclude Evidence by Kim Sentovich) filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Evidence of Future Lost Wages) filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2010-05-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of counsel in support of opposition to motion for protective order) filed.
Date: 2010-05-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2010-08-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Gregory L Spallas in Support of Motion for New Trial) filed.
Date: 2010-07-29T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (appendix of non- CA authorities) filed.
Date: 2010-04-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support) filed.
Date: 2010-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-06-22T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (motion for new trial) filed.
Date: 2010-08-13T00:00:00Opposition (Plfs Opp To Def Wal-Marts Mot For A New Trial) filed.
Date: 2010-08-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of demurrer to first amended complaint) filed.
Date: 2009-03-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for New Trial) filed.
Date: 2010-07-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in opposition) filed.
Date: 2010-04-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kia E Myers in Support of Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2010-05-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-06-01T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Index of Exhibits in support) filed.
Date: 2010-04-22T00:00:00Parties' stipulated protective order
Date: 2009-08-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of MSA) filed.
Date: 2010-02-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of K Myers in support) filed.
Date: 2010-04-30T00:00:00Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-09-28T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Opposition (to defendants ex parte request) filed.
Date: 2010-05-20T00:00:00Points and Authorities (in support) filed.
Date: 2010-05-20T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2010-05-07T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-08-03T00:00:00Statement - Other (of evidence in support of MSA) filed.
Date: 2010-02-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of R Adams in support) filed.
Date: 2010-05-20T00:00:00Statement - Other (Neutral Statement of Case) filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Notice - Other (of demurrer to first amended complaint) filed.
Date: 2009-03-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2010-07-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (application for an order continuing) filed.
Date: 2010-05-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/24/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (motion for protective order) filed.
Date: 2010-05-13T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts (ins upport of MSA) filed.
Date: 2010-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Declaration filed.
Date: 2010-07-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of K E Myers in support) filed.
Date: 2010-05-20T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Objection (to pltf's j Weyhe's evidence) filed.
Date: 2010-04-30T00:00:00Reply - Other (to pltf's separate statement) filed.
Date: 2010-04-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Gregory L. Spallas in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2010-08-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kia E Myers in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2010-08-09T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate of undisputed facts in support) filed.
Date: 2010-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-09T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: October 04, 2010Request for Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2009-03-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication filed.
Date: 2010-02-19T00:00:00Statement - Other (of undisputed facts in opposition) filed.
Date: 2010-04-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00Returned Document (Answer)
Date: 2009-06-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Trial Date and Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed.
Date: 2009-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2010-02-23T00:00:00Exhibit List filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/08/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/07/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/11/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/10/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/09/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00Proposed Jury Instructions filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Proposed Special Verdict filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/17/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/15/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Intent to Offer Excerpts of Video Recording) filed.
Date: 2010-06-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/18/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/21/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/23/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-23T00:00:00Response to Jury's Request No. 1
Date: 2010-06-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/24/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/28/2010 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/25/2010 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-25T00:00:00Jury Request No. 2
Date: 2010-06-29T00:00:00Response to Jury's Request No. 3
Date: 2010-06-29T00:00:00Jury Request No. 1
Date: 2010-06-29T00:00:00Response to Jury's Request No. 2
Date: 2010-06-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/22/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-22T00:00:00Jury Request No. 3
Date: 2010-06-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/29/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-29T00:00:00Response to Jury's Request No. 4
Date: 2010-06-30T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given
Date: 2010-06-28T00:00:00Judgment on Verdict / Notice of Entry of Judgment and Delcaration of Mailing
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00Roster of Court Reporters Pur Rule 2.950 CRC
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00Juror Questions
Date: 2010-06-25T00:00:00Jury Request No. 5
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00Jury Request No. 4
Date: 2010-06-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 07/01/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/30/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-30T00:00:00Court's Response to Jury's Request No. 5
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-07-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Mark P Velez In Suprt Of Mot for Award Of Atty Fees After Plfs Verdict) filed.
Date: 2010-07-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Mark P Velez In Suprt Of Plf Opp To Defs Mot For A New Trial) filed.
Date: 2010-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-08-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (Def Wal-Mart Stores, Incs Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial) filed.
Date: 2010-07-19T00:00:00Judgment on Verdict (Updated with Costs and Attorney Fees Awarded)
Date: August 20, 2010Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2010-04-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2010-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (the Deposition of Wal-Mart's Regional Director of Operations Deb Rood) filed.
Date: 2010-05-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Motion to Compel the Deposition) filed.
Date: 2010-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (for an Order to Compel Deposition) filed.
Date: 2010-05-07T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Protective Order as to Deposition Notice and Request for Documents) filed.
Date: 2010-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2010-05-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Debra Rood) filed.
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kia E myers) filed.
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00Order Following Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues
Date: 2010-06-03T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Intent to Offer Video Tape Deposition of Shirley Lewis at Trial) filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Intent to Offer Video Tape Deposition of Deb Rood at Trial) filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.