Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing Ii, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Sharma, Uma, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Loren E. McMaster presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoren E. McMaster Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time156 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: April 15, 2009Demurrer filed.
Date: January 29, 2009Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00FEE WAIVER ORDER
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: June 05, 2009Returned Document (Request for Default and Clerks Judgment)
Date: June 05, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.