Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
United Rentals Northwest Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anthony J Cortez, against Does 1-50, City Of Sacramento, Carrasco, Ricardo A., American Contractors Indemnity Company, represented by Eileen M Teichert, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions108 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time479 days |
Amendment to Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-04-22T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-15T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00Request for Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-09-25T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-09-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: April 23, 2010Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2009-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2009-08-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2009-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2009-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2009-04-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2009-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed.
Date: 2009-04-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Cynthia Macintosh in Support of Default Judgment Application) filed.
Date: 2009-09-25T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: April 23, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.