Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Household Finance Corp Of California, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hallie N Zimmerman, against Does 1-10, Stopka, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time794 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does (1-10) filed.
Date: March 11, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: March 11, 2009Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: March 11, 2009Declaration - Other filed.
Date: March 11, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: April 14, 2009Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: February 17, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: April 20, 2009Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: April 14, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.