Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Household Finance Corp Of California, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jerome M Yalon, Jr, against Ortiz, Vanessa R., Nimedez, Aaron R., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions213 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time213 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-06-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: July 24, 2009Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2009-02-05T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.