Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Knezovich, Maxine, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joseph J Babich, against Rivera, Ruby, Rivera, Imelda, Does 2-10, Castro, Alberto, represented by Julie K Koyama, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions674 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time737 days |
Non-Opposition filed.
Date: 2010-03-18T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.
Date: 2009-04-17T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-02-18T00:00:00Rejection of Arbitration Award and Request for Trial De Novo filed.
Date: 2009-11-06T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2010-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-15T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-05-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal submitted by Knezovich, Maxine rejected on 01/06/2011 .
Date: January 06, 2011Order granting continuance of trial and msc
Date: 2010-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (of order) filed.
Date: 2010-04-27T00:00:00Agreement to Serve as Arbitrator filed.
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-01-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-04-20T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2009-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00Notice - Other (of TIme and Place of Trial and Settlement conference) filed.
Date: 2010-04-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 04/02/2010 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2010-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2010-07-20T00:00:00Jury Fee Request For Refund - Approved filed.
Date: 2010-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2010-07-12T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: November 04, 2010Minutes finalized for Trial Assignment - Clock Start Calendar heard on 11/12/2009 04:50:00 PM .
Date: 2009-11-12T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: 2009-11-12T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial filed.
Date: 2010-02-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.