Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pacific Credit Exchange, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Frank G Blundo, Jr, against Martinez, Mario, Martinez, Barbara Y., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions124 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1241 days |
Declaration - Other (IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585 (d) AUTOMOBILE DEFICIENCY) filed.
Date: 2009-02-04T00:00:00Statement - Other (LEGAL ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT) filed.
Date: 2009-02-04T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-04-09T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-02-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does - Default Judgment Pending filed.
Date: November 18, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-02-04T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Placer) Issued
Date: February 02, 2010Writ of Execution (Sonoma) Issued
Date: February 02, 2010Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 04, 2010Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: November 18, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: April 20, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.