Beesley, Blake,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed.
February 27, 2009
Docket Event
Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor
February 27, 2009
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise heard on 02/27/2009 10:30:00 AM .
February 27, 2009
Hearing
Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise Heard
February 27, 2009
Docket Event
Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account
February 27, 2009
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Granted .
February 27, 2009
Docket Event
Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Adult Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) has been Granted .
February 02, 2009
Docket Event
Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise scheduled for 02/27/2009 at 10:30:00 AM in Department 16 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
February 02, 2009
Docket Event
Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise scheduled for 02/27/2009 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 16 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
January 22, 2009
Docket Event
Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise scheduled for 02/06/2009 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 16 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .