Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Steven S Loeb, against Schumacher, Stacie, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3556 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2009-03-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-02-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 30, 2015Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES) Issued
Date: September 04, 2014Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: December 12, 2016Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: September 04, 2014Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: August 22, 2018Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: December 15, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.