Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Raymond A Patenaude, against Does 1-15, Johnston, Isabella, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions212 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-05-07T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: November 07, 2019Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: December 14, 2009Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: November 07, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Regarding Calculation of PreJudgment Interest) filed.
Date: 2009-12-14T00:00:00Order for Supplemental Case Management Statement on Limited Civil Case generated .
Date: 2009-05-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2009-04-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-02-20T00:00:00Default denied as to Johnston, Isabella; Does 1-15 on Complaint .
Date: 2009-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-05-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2009-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-06-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-12-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration for Reimbursement of Costs CCP 1033) filed.
Date: 2009-12-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Default Judgment CCP 585) filed.
Date: 2009-12-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Waiver of Attorneys Fees Declaration) filed.
Date: 2009-12-14T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-12-14T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 03, 2015Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: October 24, 2019Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 06, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.