Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association A South Dakota Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jon O Blanda, against Does 1-100, Langeland, Tom, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions126 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time330 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: October 22, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jon O. Blanda) filed.
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Beth Lovett Pursuant to CCP Section 585) filed.
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00Returned Document (Request for Dismissal)
Date: September 14, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.