Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Song, Ai Li, Hou, Xue Li, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by James B Macy, against Yang, Tim, Yang, Sherrie Duong, Does 1-20, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert M. Twiss presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions406 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time2042 days |
Judgment
Date: February 03, 2010Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-11-16T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2010-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-06-08T00:00:00Judgment By Court
Date: January 06, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-12-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for All Proceedings Stayed heard on 03/23/2009 04:45:12 PM .
Date: 2009-03-23T00:00:00Bankruptcy - Notice of Filing filed.
Date: 2009-03-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Trial Dates) filed.
Date: 2009-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Discharge of Bankruptcy filed.
Date: 2009-12-03T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Trial Dates) filed.
Date: 2009-12-03T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Notice of MSC and Trial Dates) filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 01/05/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-01-05T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: May 19, 2014Correspondence filed.
Date: June 30, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.