Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
West Sac Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kirk E Giberson, against Barritt, Christine J., Barritt, John E., Cycle Gear Inc, Does 1-25, Gun Runner Llc, (total of 8) See All represented by Jeff Goodwin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial80 days |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time84 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2008-12-09T00:00:00Order
Date: April 13, 2009Minutes finalized for Motion for New Trial - Civil Special Sets heard on 04/10/2009 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2009-04-10T00:00:00Request to Set Case for Trial filed.
Date: 2008-12-10T00:00:00Department 45 Stipulations (Civil)
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2009-01-06T00:00:00Amended Answer filed.
Date: 2009-01-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2009-01-06T00:00:00Request to Set Case for Trial filed.
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of ex parte application for OST) filed.
Date: 2008-12-12T00:00:00Order After Special Verdict
Date: 2009-02-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-05T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2008-12-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2008-12-12T00:00:00Reply to Motion filed.
Date: 2009-04-08T00:00:00Amended Order
Date: May 26, 2009Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2008-12-12T00:00:00Application - Other (Stip & Order for Extension of Time to File Papers Supporting Motion etc) filed.
Date: 2009-03-12T00:00:00Order Granting Motion for New Trial
Date: April 15, 2009Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: June 01, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Summons Returned filed.
Date: 2008-12-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2008-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2008-12-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of John E Barritt) filed.
Date: 2008-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Trial filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Exhibit List filed.
Date: 2009-01-06T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2009-01-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/06/2009 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2009-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2009-01-13T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2009-01-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 01/27/2009 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Defendant's proposed jury instructions
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 02/11/2009 02:31:57 PM .
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 02/11/2009 02:32:05 PM .
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00Juror Questions (2 pages)
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00Exhibit List filed.
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions Withdrawn (None Except by Stipulation)
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given 2-13-09
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Question Juror Number 2 (2 pages)
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2009-01-09T00:00:00Response to Jury's Question 1
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/13/2009 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Juror No 11 question
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00Question Juror Number 12
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Jury Trial, Response to Jury's Question 2
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00Pre Jury Instructions Given 2-11-09
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00Jury Request No. 2
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/17/2009 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2009-02-27T00:00:00Jury Request No. 1
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial filed.
Date: 2009-03-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 03/09/2009 01:31:26 PM .
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00Rooster of Court Reporters Pur Rule 2.950 CRC
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: 2009-03-10T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: 2009-03-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 03/24/2009 01:49:27 PM .
Date: 2009-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 04/13/2009 01:19:48 PM .
Date: 2009-04-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: April 20, 2009Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: April 14, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.