Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Household Finance Corporation Of California, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jeffrey A Paris, against Does 1-10, Bulaya, Francoise Y., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions125 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3352 days |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2009-10-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-08-17T00:00:00Order - Other (Order on Claim of Exemption) filed.
Date: December 15, 2016Declaration - Other (Re Interest Accrued After Judgment Purs to CCP 685.050) filed.
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Opposition to Claim of Exemption) filed.
Date: 2010-02-05T00:00:00Order on Claim of Exemption
Date: 2010-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: December 01, 2016Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: January 23, 2018Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE ACCRUED DEFAULT INTEREST) filed.
Date: 2009-02-05T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-02-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (FOR COSTS C.C.P. 1033) filed.
Date: 2009-02-05T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2009-10-05T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: 2009-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing (on claim of exemtion) filed.
Date: 2010-02-05T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2009-10-20T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: August 18, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: December 01, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: January 29, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.