Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Erica L Brachfeld, against Does 1-100, Nguyen, Chi B., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 05, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions187 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time897 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 11, 2009Declaration - Other (In Support Of Application For Entry Of Judgment) filed.
Date: May 12, 2009Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 11, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Erica L Brachfeld) filed.
Date: May 12, 2009Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: May 12, 2009Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: April 21, 2011Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: April 21, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.