Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Shedrick O Davis, Iii, against Kolodrivskiy, Victor, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions293 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time885 days |
Stipulation Only - Other (Pre-Judgment) (for entry of judgment) filed.
Date: 2009-06-15T00:00:00Application - Other (of Plaintiff for Judgment) filed.
Date: 2009-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: 2008-11-24T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: October 25, 2010Judgment
Date: July 20, 2009Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: July 20, 2009Summons filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-11-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: January 26, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied (Sacramento) filed.
Date: March 04, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.