Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ramirez, Michael, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Arkady Itkin, against Does 1-25, Autozone West Inc, represented by Christopher M Harnett, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with James M. Mize presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions349 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time436 days |
Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-10-22T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2009-04-14T00:00:00Qualification Statement-Robert Proaps
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Mediation (Granted)
Date: 2009-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-04-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: September 14, 2009Answer filed.
Date: 2008-11-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for Use of Private Alternative Dispute Resolution filed.
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-10-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Fee Waiver - Order re Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: August 24, 2009Notice Of Assingment Of Arditration Hearin Date
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.