Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Escobar, Moises, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with James P. Arguelles presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions224 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2967 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: September 13, 2016Paper Exhibits (Exhibits in Support of Judgment) filed.
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed.
Date: 2008-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-07-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-07-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Re: Computation of Interest etc) filed.
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Compliance with CCP 1033) filed.
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Declaration of Due Diligence filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: August 27, 2010Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES) Issued
Date: May 19, 2015Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: November 03, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: February 29, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.