Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Avad Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lorna Walker, against Does 1-20, Kipp, Christopher S., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions337 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time976 days |
Agreement to Serve as Arbitrator filed.
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-12-11T00:00:00Motion to Deem Facts Admitted filed.
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2008-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-12-01T00:00:00Award of Arbitrator filed.
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00Judgment in Arbitration Proceedings
Date: 2009-06-08T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator
Date: 2009-01-06T00:00:00Notice - Other (of non-appearance) filed.
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: June 24, 2009Writ of Execution submitted by Avad LLC rejected on 12/29/2009 .
Date: December 29, 2009Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: June 24, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: February 24, 2011Writ of Execution Issued
Date: January 13, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 03, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.