Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janalie Henriques, against Diamond Hill Marketing Inc, Does 1-5, Yang, Tongxee, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions242 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time381 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Does 1-5 Dismissed
Date: May 21, 2009Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: November 17, 2008Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-09-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court Granted
Date: May 21, 2009Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 16, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.