Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Northern California Collection Service Inc Of Sacramento, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Steven D Cribb, against Borushko, Vitaliy, Does 1-10, O K Enterprises & Development, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin R. Culhane Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions340 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time890 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-04-24T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: 2009-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-01-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-06-05T00:00:00Motion - Other (FOR EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDER) filed.
Date: 2010-03-23T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2010-03-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-06-05T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-06-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-06-05T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Return on Bench Warrant - OX Calendar heard on 03/01/2010 08:15:00 AM .
Date: 2010-03-01T00:00:00Civil Bench Warrant - Issued
Date: 2009-12-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 11/09/2009 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2009-11-09T00:00:00Bench Warrant Returned (OX) filed.
Date: 2010-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2009-12-04T00:00:00Declaration of Due Diligence
Date: 2009-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2010-04-20T00:00:00Civil Bench Warrant - Issued
Date: April 26, 2010Declaration - Other (of Larry Cassidy) filed.
Date: 2010-03-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Return on Bench Warrant - OX Calendar heard on 03/29/2010 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00Order After Hearing
Date: June 15, 2010Bench Warrant Returned (OX) filed.
Date: July 27, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: December 07, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: July 29, 2010Proof of Service filed.
Date: July 27, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.