Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jerome M Yalon, Jr, Stelios A Harris, against Barrientos, Mike A., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions115 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time239 days |
Writ of Execution Without Supporting Documents
Date: February 24, 2009Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2008-10-23T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-07-09T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: January 23, 2009Proof of Service filed.
Date: December 24, 2008Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2008-10-23T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-10-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec re: Waiver of Excess Atty Fees) filed.
Date: 2008-10-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: January 12, 2009Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: January 12, 2009Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2008-12-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Yolo) Issued
Date: January 28, 2009Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: January 28, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.