Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Murphy, Michael W., filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time98 days |
Petition for Change of Name filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Amended Order to Show Cause for Change of Name
Date: August 19, 2008Order to Show Cause for Change of Name
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 07/25/2008 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2008-07-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00ORDER RE: FEE WAIVER HEARING
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00FEE WAIVER ORDER-DENIED
Date: 2008-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Publication filed.
Date: September 17, 2008Decree Changing Name
Date: September 30, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.