Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
North Star Capital Acquisition Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert Scott Kennard, against Does 1-10, Gabaldon, Shara L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 27, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions171 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4170 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does (1-10) filed.
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2014-03-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: November 07, 2018Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2013-04-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2010-11-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: 2015-03-23T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: November 07, 2018Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Re Computation of Interest) filed.
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00Default denied as to Gabaldon, Shara L on Complaint .
Date: 2008-12-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2008-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-07-07T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2011-01-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Issued) Issued
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2010-11-24T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: 2009-01-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Alameda) Issued
Date: 2013-06-04T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2012-11-29T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Butte) Issued
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2013-12-06T00:00:00Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: December 22, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: July 17, 2018Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: August 31, 2018Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: November 27, 2019Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: March 07, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: May 21, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.