Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
North Star Capital Acquisiton Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ann K Merrill, against Does 1-10, Wiley, Charlotte L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 27, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions94 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2495 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2008-09-29T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: May 15, 2014Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-06-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2008-07-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-07-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: 2008-09-29T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-09-29T00:00:00Default denied as to Wiley, Charlotte L on Complaint .
Date: 2008-09-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: May 15, 2014Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: October 22, 2008Writ of Execution (Solano) Issued
Date: May 15, 2014Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES) Issued
Date: April 21, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: April 27, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.