Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Finance And Thrift Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Steven A Silver, against Santos, Griselda, Does 1-50, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions186 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1509 days |
Ret doc; need dismissal as to doe defendants
Date: 2009-12-05T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2010-06-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: July 12, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-06-16T00:00:00Request for Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-08-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-07-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-16T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec re: Interest, Costs, Atty Fees) filed.
Date: 2009-08-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: 2009-08-07T00:00:00Documents Returned(Court Judgment)Rejected
Date: 2010-05-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: September 06, 2011Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed.
Date: 2011-08-31T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirm Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel, 9/27/11, Dropped) filed.
Date: September 12, 2011Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed.
Date: 2011-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (Venue) filed.
Date: 2010-09-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.