Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Household Finance Corp Of Caifornia, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Donald R Stebbins, against Does 1-10, Sowash, David F., Sowash, Yolanda P., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions174 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: April 30, 2008Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: October 16, 2008Summons filed.
Date: April 30, 2008Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: May 09, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00Returned Document (Answer)
Date: June 17, 2008Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: October 16, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.